Senate
|
06/03/2024
|
Effective date: See Act.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2024
|
Becomes Act No. 409
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2024
|
Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/4/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2024
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2024
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2024
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 94, nays 0. Having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2024
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2024
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 1 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2024.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2024
|
Conference committee report received.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2024
|
Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2024
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2024
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Miller, Foil, and Luneau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
House conferees appointed: Glorioso, Emerson, and Henry.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/28/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/23/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Reported favorably (14-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 1 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|