House
|
05/28/2024
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 43, nays 51. Failed to pass.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/28/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/23/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Reported with amendments (10-2-1). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 30 yeas and 7 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2024
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|