House | 05/30/2024 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
House | 05/29/2024 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2024 | Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2024 | Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2024 | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2024 | Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
Senate | 02/29/2024 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |