Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Effective date 1/1/2025.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 148.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 4. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/14/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Reported favorably (13-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted; ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|