Senate
|
06/03/2024
|
Effective date: See Act.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2024
|
Becomes Act No. 405
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2024
|
Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2024
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 3. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/28/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/23/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Reported with amendments (11-0-1). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
Read by title, amended, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Reported with amendments (14-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|