House
|
06/03/2024
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 68, nays 30. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2024
|
By a vote of 75 yeas, 27 nays, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the House approved consideration after the 82nd calendar day.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2024
|
Notice Senate approved consideration after the 82nd calendar day.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2024
|
Read by title. The Senate approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 82nd calendar day by a vote of 27 yeas and 9 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2024
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2024
|
Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 62, nays 33. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider pending.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/30/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Reported with amendments (9-3). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Discharged from the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 26 yeas and 11 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|