Senate
|
05/28/2024
|
Effective date 5/28/2024.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2024
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 307.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2024
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/23/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/20/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
Reported with amendments (10-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|