Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
Effective date 7/4/2024.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 37.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/13/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 29 yeas and 10 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2024
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 70, nays 25. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/06/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Reported with amendments (9-3). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 27 yeas and 11 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
|
|
|