Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Effective date 5/1/2024.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/25/2024.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate on 4/25/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 85, nays 9. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Rules suspended, called out of its regular order.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/24/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Reported favorably (16-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 31 yeas and 8 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Read by title; made Special Order of the Day No. 1 for March 26, 2024.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|