Senate
|
06/19/2024
|
Effective date 6/19/2024.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2024
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 761.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2024
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/4/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2024
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/4/2024.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2024
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2024
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 98, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2024
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2024
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2024
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2024
|
Conference Committee report received.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2024
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2024
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Womack, Miller, and Stine.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
House conferees appointed: Gadberry, Bourriaque, and Romero.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/29/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Reported favorably (14-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Discharged from the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Received in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|