House
|
05/29/2024
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/29/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/14/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Reported with amendments (9-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
|
|
|