House | 03/20/2024 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. | ||
Senate | 03/01/2024 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |