Senate
|
06/19/2024
|
Effective date 8/1/2024.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2024
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 765.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2024
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2024
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2024
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2024
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2024
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 92, nays 1. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2024
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/31/2024.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Conference committee report received.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
House conferees appointed: Muscarello, Firment, and Chenevert.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Stine, Foil, and Miller.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 35 yeas and 2 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 83, nays 20. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/15/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
Reported with amendments (12-0-1). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|