House
|
05/06/2024
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/06/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Reported with amendments (10-4). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 28 yeas and 9 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Insurance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance.
|
|
|