Senate
|
06/03/2024
|
Effective date 6/3/2024.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2024
|
Becomes Act No. 483 without the Governor's signature.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 9. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/20/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Reported favorably (14-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 2 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|