House | 04/29/2024 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | ||
House | 04/25/2024 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2024 | Read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2024 | Called from the Calendar. | ||
Senate | 04/23/2024 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2024 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2024 | Reported with amendments. | ||
Senate | 03/26/2024 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. | ||
Senate | 03/25/2024 | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |