Senate | 04/29/2024 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted; ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Judiciary A. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2024 | Reported with amendments. | ||
Senate | 04/23/2024 | By a vote of 16 yeas and 21 nays. Motion to recommit failed to pass. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2024 | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Insurance. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2024 | Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |