Senate | 05/13/2024 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2024 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | ||
Senate | 05/07/2024 | Reported with amendments. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Judiciary A. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |