House
|
05/23/2024
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/23/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Reported with amendments (13-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|