Senate
|
06/19/2024
|
Effective date 8/1/2024.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2024
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 770.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2024
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2024
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 75, nays 16. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/28/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Reported with amendments (14-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2024
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Insurance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|