House | 05/21/2024 | Received in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | Called from the Calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2024 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2024 | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2024 | Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |