Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Effective date 5/23/2024.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 181.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 76, nays 16. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/08/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/06/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Reported with amendments (13-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 30 yeas and 8 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Substitute for Senate Bill No. 275. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|