Senate
|
06/18/2024
|
Effective date 6/18/2024.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2024
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 667.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2024
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2024
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2024
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/30/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Reported favorably (17-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Reported with amendments (8-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Discharged from the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|