House
|
05/29/2024
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 60, nays 27. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/29/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 68, nays 22. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider pending.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/23/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Reported with amendments (11-0-1). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Reported favorably (11-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 28 yeas and 11 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|