Senate | 04/02/2024 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 3/28/2024. | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
Senate | 03/25/2024 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2024 | Received from the House without amendments. | ||
House | 03/20/2024 | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. | ||
House | 03/20/2024 | Received in the House from the Senate. | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |