Senate
|
06/03/2024
|
Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2024
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Read by title, concurred in by vote of 99 yeas, 0 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/28/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Reported with amendments (13-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
Received in the House from the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
Read by title and adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 1 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|