Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/17/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
Read by title, concurred in by vote of 83 yeas, 9 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/13/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/09/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Reported favorably (12-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
Received in the House from the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
Read by title and adopted by a vote of 31 yeas and 1 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|