Senate
|
06/03/2024
|
Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2024
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Read by title, concurred in by vote of 101 yeas, 0 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/28/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Reported favorably (10-0).
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
Received in the House from the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered engrossed and sent to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|