Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/17/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Read by title, concurred in by vote of 78 yeas, 1 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/09/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Reported with amendments (12-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
Received in the House from the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays; ordered engrossed and sent to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|