Senate | 05/13/2024 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/9/2024. | ||
House | 05/07/2024 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2024 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2024 | Received from the House without amendments. | ||
House | 04/30/2024 | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. | ||
House | 04/30/2024 | Received in the House from the Senate. | ||
Senate | 04/30/2024 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |