Senate | 06/03/2024 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. | ||
House | 05/30/2024 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | Received from the House without amendments. | ||
House | 05/28/2024 | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 99 yeas, 0 nays. | ||
House | 05/23/2024 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/28/2024. | ||
House | 05/23/2024 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/22/2024 | Reported favorably (9-0-1). | ||
House | 05/20/2024 | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. | ||
House | 05/20/2024 | Received in the House from the Senate. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2024 | Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2024 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. | ||
Senate | 05/07/2024 | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |