Senate | 05/28/2024 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/24/2024. | ||
House | 05/22/2024 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | Received from the House without amendments. | ||
House | 05/20/2024 | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. | ||
House | 05/20/2024 | Received in the House from the Senate. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and adopted by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |