Senate | 06/03/2024 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2024 | Received from the House without amendments. | ||
House | 05/22/2024 | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. | ||
House | 05/22/2024 | Received in the House from the Senate. | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |