House | 06/02/2024 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 05/31/2024 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. | ||
House | 05/31/2024 | Received in the House from the Senate. | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays; ordered engrossed and sent to the House. | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2024 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |