Senate | 06/03/2024 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted. | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | Called from the Calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2024 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2024 | Rules suspended. | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | Reported with amendments. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2024 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |