House | 04/28/2025 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 71, nays 13. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/28/2025. | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Reported favorably (13-0). | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Prefiled. |