Senate | 04/29/2025 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. | ||
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/24/2025. | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Reported favorably (14-0). | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Prefiled. |