House | 04/28/2025 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 69, nays 17. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/28/2025. | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Reported favorably (11-0-1). | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | ||
House | 04/04/2025 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | ||
House | 04/04/2025 | Prefiled. |