LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2025 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB637
Action History
LA
Louisiana House Bill HB637
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2025 Regular Session
Louisiana House Bill HB637
Action History
House
04/29/2025
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
House
04/28/2025
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/29/2025.
House
04/24/2025
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
House
04/23/2025
Reported favorably (10-0).
House
04/22/2025
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
House
04/16/2025
Read by title.