House | 05/14/2025 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. | ||
House | 05/13/2025 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. | ||
House | 05/13/2025 | Received in the House from the Senate. | ||
Senate | 05/12/2025 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2025 | Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. | ||
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |