Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware House Bill HCR15

Introduced
3/14/23  
Introduced
3/14/23  

Caption

Designating March 14, 2023 As "equal Pay Day" In The State Of Delaware.

Impact

The resolution seeks to recognize March 14 as a significant date that symbolizes when women's earnings catch up to men's from the previous year, emphasizing the ongoing challenges women face regarding fair wages. While the resolution itself does not enact new laws, it serves to promote discussions around pay equity and the implementation of fair pay policies both in the public and private sectors. It encourages legislative and community leaders to consider measures that can help close the wage gap.

Summary

HCR15, titled 'Designating March 14, 2023, As Equal Pay Day in the State of Delaware', aims to raise awareness about the gender wage gap that continues to affect women across the state and the nation. The resolution highlights the persistent inequalities in earnings between men and women, noting that women in Delaware earn only 86% of what men earn on average. Special attention is drawn to the disparities faced by women of color, with Black women earning only 69% and Latina women earning 58% of their white male counterparts' wages.

Sentiment

The sentiment surrounding HCR15 is largely supportive, with a broad consensus among lawmakers on the importance of addressing wage disparities. Supporters argue that designating Equal Pay Day is a step toward enabling women to gain acknowledgment of their contributions to the workforce and emphasizing the need for policy changes that promote pay equity. However, there may be critics who question the effectiveness of such resolutions in creating tangible changes in wage practices.

Contention

Although HCR15 is primarily a resolution rather than a legislative bill imposing mandates, it does mark a notable point of consideration in the larger conversation surrounding equal pay. There exists a contention regarding the effectiveness of awareness campaigns versus actual policy reforms that could secure pay equity. The discussion around the resolution highlights the broader societal need to address systemic inequalities and the importance of taking legislative action to foster a more equitable workplace.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Previously Filed As

DE HCR24

Recognizing April 25, 2023, As "delaware Teach Children To Save Day".

DE HCR49

Recognizing May 20, 2023, As "armed Forces Day".

DE HCR100

Recognizing May 10th As Major George S. Welch Day.

DE HCR73

Recognizing June 25th-july 1st, 2023 As "deafblind Awareness Week

DE HCR128

Recognizing May 6-10, 2024, As "teacher Appreciation Week" In The State Of Delaware.

DE HCR44

Recognizing May 8-12, 2023 As "teacher Appreciation Week".

DE HCR163

Honoring The Marine Corps 249th Birthday On November 10, 2024.

DE HCR53

Recognizing May 2023 As "foster Care Month" In The State Of Delaware.

Similar Bills

No similar bills found.