Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware House Bill HCR24

Introduced
4/25/23  
Introduced
4/25/23  

Caption

Recognizing April 25, 2023, As "delaware Teach Children To Save Day".

Impact

The adoption of HCR24 reinforces the importance of financial education in schools by fostering partnerships between banks and educational institutions. Notably, in the previous year, more than 250 bankers from various banks engaged with over 7,000 students across 80 schools, imparting vital knowledge about the importance of savings. This recognition aims to continue this trend and encourage similar programs that build strong financial foundations for the youth of Delaware.

Summary

HCR24, recognized as 'Delaware Teach Children to Save Day', acknowledges April 25, 2023, as a significant date for promoting financial literacy among children. This resolution highlights the efforts of the Delaware Financial Education Alliance in collaboration with the University of Delaware's Center for Economic Education and Entrepreneurship, which initiated Teach Children to Save Day in 1998. The aim of this initiative is to foster an understanding of savings and enhance financial skills among young learners, an essential component of their education.

Sentiment

The sentiment surrounding HCR24 is largely positive, reflecting a strong agreement on the need for financial literacy among children. Supporters advocate for enhancing students' understanding of savings as a crucial life skill. The bipartisan support for this resolution, as evidenced by sponsorship from members of both the House and Senate, indicates a common belief in the value of equipping the next generation with better financial management skills.

Contention

While there doesn't appear to be significant contention surrounding HCR24, discussions related to educational priorities and funding for financial literacy programs could arise as this initiative seeks to expand. The success of efforts like Teach Children to Save Day may depend on sustained support and resources for educators to effectively implement financial education initiatives in their curricula, ensuring that the benefits of such programs reach all children.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Previously Filed As

DE HCR23

In Celebration Of The 85th Anniversary Of The Claymont Lions Club.

DE HCR18

Designating March 23, 2023 As National Atheists Day In Delaware.

DE HCR42

Recognizing The Month Of May 2023 As Mental Health Awareness Month.

DE HCR28

Designating March 30, 2023, As Atheist Awareness Day In Delaware.

DE HCR7

Recognizing January 27th, 2023 As International Holocaust Remembrance Day.

DE HCR5

Designating January 22-28, 2023 As Certified Registered Nurse Anesthetists' Week In The State Of Delaware.

DE HCR3

Designating January 23, 2023, As "maternal Health Awareness Day" In The State Of Delaware.

DE HCR30

Recognizing The Holy Month Of Ramadan And Muslim Residents Of This State As They Observe Ramadan.

Similar Bills

TX HB2492

Relating to the family allowance, treatment of exempt property, and an allowance in lieu of exempt property in the administration of a decedent's estate.

CA AB1221

Children’s advocacy centers.

CA SB18

Bill of Rights for the Children and Youth of California: joint legislative committee.

CA SB1447

Hospitals: seismic compliance: Children’s Hospital Los Angeles.

CA AB1737

Children’s camps: safety.

CA AB555

California state preschool programs: reimbursement amounts: adjustment factors.

CA AR68

Relative to Children’s Environmental Health Month 2021.

CA AR123

Relative to Children’s Environmental Health Month.