Iowa 2025-2026 Regular Session

Iowa Senate Bill SSB1232

Introduced
4/28/25  

Caption

A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations to the justice system.

Impact

The bill is expected to play a significant role in addressing crime and enhancing public safety across the state. Notably, it supports initiatives related to human trafficking, providing specific appropriations for victim assistance programs. The bill also emphasizes the importance of maintaining and improving the technological and cybersecurity infrastructure necessary for effective law enforcement operations. The financial backing for these initiatives is intended to strengthen the overall justice system and its capacity to protect the public.

Summary

Senate Study Bill 1232 is an act that relates to and makes appropriations for the Iowa justice system for the fiscal year 2025-2026. The bill designates funding for various departments including the Department of Justice, Department of Corrections, Department of Public Safety, and the Iowa Law Enforcement Academy. It aims to provide the necessary financial resources for maintaining essential services such as prosecutorial functions, victim assistance, and law enforcement operations. The allocations include specific amounts for training programs, operational costs, and support resources within these pivotal departments.

Contention

While the bill lays out substantial support for the justice system, there may be points of contention regarding how the appropriated funds are allocated. Some stakeholders could argue about the adequacy of the funding levels for specific programs, particularly those focused on human trafficking and victim assistance. Furthermore, discussions around the effectiveness and efficiency of the proposed allocations versus existing funding may arise as the funds are implemented, ensuring that the intended outcomes are effectively achieved.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Previously Filed As

IA SSB1233

A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations to the judicial branch.

IA SSB3203

A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations to the judicial branch, including by modifying the judicial retirement fund and membership of district judicial nominating commissions, and including effective date provisions.(See SF 2436.)

IA SSB3200

A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations to the justice system.(See SF 2434.)

IA SSB3201

A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations to the education system, including the funding and operation of the department for the blind, department of education, and state board of regents, and including effective date provisions.(See SF 2435.)

IA SSB1231

A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations to the education system, including the funding and operation of the department for the blind, department of education, and state board of regents, and including contingent effective date provisions.

IA SSB1236

A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations for the economic development of the state, including to the economic development authority, Iowa finance authority, department of workforce development, and the state board of regents and certain regents institutions.

IA SSB3198

A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations for the economic development of the state, including to the economic development authority, the Iowa finance authority, the public employment relations board, the department of workforce development, and the state board of regents and certain regents institutions.(See SF 2432.)

Similar Bills

IA HF2693

A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations to the justice system, and including effective date provisions. Effective date: 05/09/2024, 07/01/2024.

IA SF2434

A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations to the justice system.(Formerly SSB 3200.)

IA SSB3200

A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations to the justice system.(See SF 2434.)

IA SF562

A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations to the justice system, including by providing for payments associated with indigent defense and representation, the funding of activities relating to consumer fraud and antitrust, a corrections capital reinvestment fund, an Iowa law enforcement academy study, a human trafficking study, and the funding of peace officer retirement, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 1214.) Effective date: Enactment, 06/01/2023, 06/30/2023, 07/01/2023. Applicability date: 07/01/2022.

IA SSB1214

A bill for an act relating to appropriations to the justice system.(See SF 562.)

IA SSB3191

A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations to the justice system.

IA SSB1224

A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations to the justice system, including a corrections capital reinvestment fund, the funding of activities relating to consumer education and litigation, and a corrections federal receipts fund, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions.

IA HF727

A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations to the justice system, including by providing for payments associated with indigent defense and representation, the funding of activities relating to consumer fraud and antitrust, a corrections capital reinvestment fund, an Iowa law enforcement academy study, a human trafficking study, and the funding of peace officer retirement, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions.(Formerly HSB 251.)