House | 07/01/2024 | Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/27/2024 | Senate concurred | ||
House | 05/20/2024 | Reporting date extended to Friday June 28, 2024, pending concurrence | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Reporting date extended to Friday May 17, 2024, pending concurrence | ||
Joint | 06/12/2023 | Location Changed - Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 | ||
Joint | 06/12/2023 | Location Changed - Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 and virtual | ||
Joint | 06/08/2023 | Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |