House | 05/06/2024 | Discharged to the committee on House Rules | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently | ||
Joint | 06/12/2023 | Location Changed - Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 | ||
Joint | 06/12/2023 | Location Changed - Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 and virtual | ||
Joint | 06/08/2023 | Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Senate concurred | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |