Massachusetts 2023-2024 Regular Session

Massachusetts House Bill H1274 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/16/2023

                            1 of 1
HOUSE DOCKET, NO. 2458       FILED ON: 1/19/2023
HOUSE . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . No. 1274
The Commonwealth of Massachusetts
_________________
PRESENTED BY:
Bradley H. Jones, Jr.
_________________
To the Honorable Senate and House of Representatives of the Commonwealth of Massachusetts in General
Court assembled:
The undersigned legislators and/or citizens respectfully petition for the adoption of the accompanying bill:
An Act relative to higher education tuition and fee waivers for seniors.
_______________
PETITION OF:
NAME:DISTRICT/ADDRESS :DATE ADDED:Bradley H. Jones, Jr.20th Middlesex1/18/2023Nicholas A. Boldyga3rd Hampden1/26/2023Peter J. Durant6th Worcester1/26/2023Susan Williams Gifford2nd Plymouth1/26/2023F. Jay Barrows1st Bristol1/26/2023 1 of 2
HOUSE DOCKET, NO. 2458       FILED ON: 1/19/2023
HOUSE . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . No. 1274
By Representative Jones of North Reading, a petition (accompanied by bill, House, No. 1274) of 
Bradley H. Jones, Jr. and others relative to higher education tuition and fee waivers for seniors. 
Higher Education.
The Commonwealth of Massachusetts
_______________
In the One Hundred and Ninety-Third General Court
(2023-2024)
_______________
An Act relative to higher education tuition and fee waivers for seniors.
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Court assembled, and by the authority 
of the same, as follows:
1 SECTION 1. There is hereby established a pilot reimbursement program for all public 
2institutions of higher education in the Commonwealth, including all state universities, 
3community colleges and University of Massachusetts campuses, providing tuition and fee 
4waivers for senior citizens 	age 60 and older pursuant to the provisions of section 19 of chapter 
515A of the General Laws. Said tuition and fee waivers shall apply to qualifying seniors who are 
6enrolled in undergraduate programs, summer sessions, evening classes, or any specific higher 
7education courses or set of courses between July 1, 2023 and June 30, 2024, but said enrollment 
8shall be subject to space availability and shall not exceed four courses per academic year. On or 
9before August 1, 2024, all state universities, community colleges and University of 
10Massachusetts campuses shall provide the state Comptroller, the House and Senate Ways and 
11Means Committees, and the Joint Committee on Higher Education with a detailed breakdown of 
12the tuition and fee revenues foregone as a result of said waivers. Upon receipt and certification of 
13said figures, the Comptroller is hereby authorized and directed to transfer money from the  2 of 2
14General Fund to each state university, community college and University of Massachusetts 
15campus in an amount equal to its foregone tuition and fee revenues. The total revenues 
16reimbursed as part of the pilot program shall serve as the base funding level to cover the annual 
17cost of senior citizen tuition and fee waivers in the General Appropriations Act beginning in 
18Fiscal Year 2025.