House | 06/27/2024 | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means | ||
House | 05/06/2024 | Discharged to the committee on House Rules | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Accompanied by S72 | ||
Joint | 09/07/2023 | Hearing rescheduled to 09/12/2023 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium | ||
Joint | 09/05/2023 | Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2023 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Senate concurred | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |