LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Massachusetts MA
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
H17
Action History
MA
Massachusetts House Bill H17
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Massachusetts 2023-2024 Regular Session
Massachusetts House Bill H17
Action History
House
08/12/2024
Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
House
04/08/2024
Discharged to the committee on House Rules
House
03/18/2024
Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
Joint
03/29/2023
Hearing scheduled for 04/04/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
Senate
02/16/2023
Senate concurred
House
02/16/2023
Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service