House | 03/11/2024 | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Discharged to the committee on House Rules | ||
House | 11/20/2023 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently | ||
Joint | 07/21/2023 | Hearing scheduled for 07/26/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 | ||
Senate | 06/15/2023 | Senate concurred | ||
House | 06/12/2023 | Discharged to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |