LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Massachusetts MA
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
H1975
Action History
MA
Massachusetts House Bill H1975
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Massachusetts 2023-2024 Regular Session
Massachusetts House Bill H1975
Action History
House
04/18/2024
Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
House
04/18/2024
Accompanied by S1266
House
03/04/2024
Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
Joint
10/30/2023
Hearing scheduled for 11/06/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
Senate
02/16/2023
Senate concurred
House
02/16/2023
Referred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery